US SB312 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 68.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands statutory authority for federal prisoners to be released before completing their sentences or to be placed in the community to serve the final portion of their sentences. First, the bill makes changes to the early release pilot program. The early release pilot program authorizes the Bureau of Prisons to release early and place on home confinement elderly offenders and terminally ill offenders who meet eligibility criteria. expands eligibility to offenders serving time for an offense under the laws of the District of Columbia, expands eligibility to offenders who have served at least one-half (currently, two-thirds) of their prison term, reduces the amount of time an offender must serve by the good time credits earned by the offender, and creates a judicial review process for prisoners and shortens the waiting period for judicial review during the COVID-19 pandemic. Second, the bill modifies the compassionate release process. The compassionate release process authorizes federal courts to reduce a prisoner's sentence and impose a term of probation or supervised released in certain circumstances. expands eligibility to prisoners sentenced before November 1, 1987, specifies that vulnerability to COVID-19 is a basis for compassionate release, and shortens the waiting period for judicial review during the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID–19 Safer Detention Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 68.
2021-06-08SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-05-27SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-02-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB929 (Related) 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3669 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback