US SB3094 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018 This bill prohibits the U.S. Coast Guard from: (1) implementing the rule titled "Transportation Worker Identification Credential (TWIC)-Reader Requirements," and (2) proposing or issuing a notice of proposed rulemaking for a rule that would require the use of biometric readers for biometric transportation security cards. These prohibitions end 60 days after the Department of Homeland Security submits to Congress an assessment of the transportation security card program.
Title
Transportation Worker Identification Credential Accountability Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 524. |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-305. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5729 (Same As) 2018-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-230. (TXT | PDF)