US SB308 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S807)
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a land exchange upon request by the San Bernadino Valley Water Conservation District in California. Specifically, Interior must (1) convey to the district in 327 acres of identified federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management and any portion of an identified federal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged, and (2) accept in exchange 310 acres of district land and any portion of an identified nonfederal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S807)

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB1067 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback