US SB3053 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Weather Research and Forecasting Innovation Act of 2017 to require the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to develop a plan and national guidance document to improve precipitation estimates, and for other purposes.
Title
PRECIP Act Providing Research and Estimates of Changes In Precipitation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1437 (Related) 2022-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-229.