US SB3050 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 723.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

21st Century IDEA 21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st Century IDEA 21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 723.
2018-12-05SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-418.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-06-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB5759 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Presented to President.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback