US SB3046 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to codify the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior to conduct certain landscape-scale forest restoration projects, and for other purposes.
Title
Root and Stem Project Authorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10102-10103; text: CR S10102-10103) |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 548. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-197. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB9184 (Related) 2022-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.