US SB3042 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7156-7158)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7156-7158)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill making appropriations for the Departments of Commerce and Justice, Science, and Related Agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Commerce, Justice, Science, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2022 Science Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Commerce Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Justice Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7156-7158) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4505 (Related) 2021-07-28 - Rule H. Res. 567 passed House.
HR567 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - On motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 201 - 192 (Roll no. 234).
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
HR567 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - On motion to table the motion to reconsider Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 201 - 192 (Roll no. 234).
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3042/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3042/BILLS-117s3042is.pdf |