US SB3031 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Personal Property Management Act of 2018 This bill requires the executive agencies and the General Services Administration (GSA) to carry out the following activities with respect to federal personal property management. Each executive agency, in accordance with guidance from the GSA, must annually inventory and assess capitalized personal property in identifying excess property under the agency's control. Capitalized personal property items include those recorded on an agency's general ledger records as major investments or assets. Each agency must also regularly inventory and assess accountable personal property under its control. GSA may establish separate thresholds for acquisitions of personal property for which affected agencies shall capitalize and for which they shall establish and maintain property records in a centralized system.
Title
Federal Personal Property Management Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 481 (Y: 383 N: 1 NV: 48 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 383 - 1 (Roll no. 481). (text CR H10526-10527) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10536-10537) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3031. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10526-10527) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-13 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7525-7526; text: CR S7525-7526) |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 621. |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-343. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement