US SB300 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to address the history of discrimination against Black farmers and ranchers, to require reforms within the Department of Agriculture to prevent future discrimination, and for other purposes.
Title
Justice for Black Farmers Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1393 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB4421 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB2332 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB4421 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
SB2332 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/300/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s300/BILLS-117s300is.pdf |