US SB2977 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends to December 31, 2021, statutory provisions requiring sanctions on foreign persons responsible for violence or human rights abuses in Venezuela. Currently, such provisions are set to expire December 31, 2019.
Title
Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Extension Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Foreign property
International affairs
Latin America
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Venezuela
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
International affairs
Latin America
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Venezuela
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers