US SB297 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that the Federal Trade Commission's regulation of the labeling of products as Made in the U.S.A. or Made in America supersedes any conflicting state laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reinforcing American-Made Products Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-09-17HouseReceived in the House.
2021-09-15SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-09-14SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6481)
2021-09-14SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6481)
2021-02-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB5474 (Same As) 2021-10-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback