US SB2967 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 617.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 617.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Commission on Intergovernmental Relations of the United States. The commission shall, among other things, provide a forum for discussing ways to improve the administration and coordination of federal grant-in-aid, regulatory, tax, and other programs requiring intergovernmental cooperation, and identify the intergovernmental impacts of rulings by the U.S. Supreme Court on federal, state, tribal, and local governments.
Title
Restore the Partnership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 617. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-314. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3883 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers