US SB2927 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands research endowments available through the National Institute on Minority Health and Health Disparities to include former centers of excellence at certain historically black colleges and universities and at biomedical and behavioral research institutions with a significant number of minority students.
Title
NIMHD Research Endowment Revitalization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2562; text: CR S2562) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4499 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 595.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Minority education
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Education programs funding
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Minority education
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding