US SB2916 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 727.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 727.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide that the pueblo of Santa Clara may lease for 99 years certain restricted land, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Indian Long-Term Leasing Act to expand the land of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo that may be leased for up to 99 years with the approval of the Department of the Interior, from lands held in trust, to all of the lands of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo.
Title
A bill to provide that the pueblo of Santa Clara may lease for 99 years certain restricted land, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 727. |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-431. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4255 (Related) 2015-12-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.