US SB2910 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness and Independence in Redistricting Act - Prohibits a state that has been redistricted after an apportionment from being redistricted again until after the next apportionment of Representatives, unless the state is ordered by a court to conduct such a subsequent redistricting in order to comply with the U.S. Constitution or enforce the Voting Rights Act of 1965. Requires such redistricting to be conducted through a plan developed by the independent redistricting commission established in the state, or if such plan is not enacted into law, the redistricting plan selected by the state's highest court or developed by a U.S. district court. Prescribes requirements for: (1) establishment of a state independent redistricting commission (including provisions for holding each of its meetings in public and maintaining a public Internet website); (2) development of a redistricting plan (including soliciting and considering public comments) and its submission to the state legislature (with public notice of plans at least seven days prior to such submission); (3) selection of a plan, under specified conditions, by the state's highest court or the U.S. district court for the district in which the capital of the state is located; (4) special rules for redistricting conducted under a federal court order; and (5) Election Assistance Commission payments to states for carrying out redistricting.
Title
Fairness and Independence in Redistricting Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB223 (Related) 2013-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB278 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB2490 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2758 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2978 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB278 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
HB2490 (Related) 2013-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2758 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB2978 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Political representation
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Political representation
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2910/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2910/BILLS-113s2910is.pdf |