US SB2904 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-258. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-258. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) and the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) to support research on generative adversarial networks. A generative adversarial network is a software system designed to be trained with authentic inputs (e.g., photographs) to generate similar, but artificial, outputs (e.g., deepfakes). Specifically, the NSF must support research on manipulated or synthesized content and information authenticity and the NIST must support research for the development of measurements and standards necessary to accelerate the development of the technological tools to examine the function and outputs of generative adversarial networks or other technologies that synthesize or manipulate content.
Title
IOGAN Act Identifying Outputs of Generative Adversarial Networks Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-258. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7022-7023) |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7022-7023) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. Tonko asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-11-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7082-7083; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7082-7083) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580. |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-289. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4355 (Related) 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Photography and imaging
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Research ethics
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Photography and imaging
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Research ethics
Science, technology, communications
Technology assessment