US SB2899 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to require the Director of the Bureau of Prisons to address deficiencies and make necessary upgrades to the security camera and radio systems of the Bureau of Prisons to ensure the health and safety of employees and inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prison Camera Reform Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-10-21HouseReceived in the House.
2021-10-21SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-10-20SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7132)
2021-10-20SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7132)
2021-09-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB5975 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback