US SB2899 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Incentive Act - Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to: (1) extend through 2012 grants for investment in renewable energy property, including renewable resources used to produce electricity and fuel cell, solar, wind, geothermal, and microturbine property, in lieu of tax credits; and (2) expand eligibility for such grants to public power utilities and qualified solar manufacturing project property. Defines "qualified solar manufacturing property" as any tangible personal property purchased to re-equip, expand, or establish a manufacturing facility for producing solar energy equipment to generate electricity. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow an energy tax credit for investment in qualified solar manufacturing project property; (2) allow a tax credit for the purchase, consolidation, and use of contiguous high solarity disturbed private land to produce solar energy for use in a trade or business; and (3) limit the energy tax credit for solar energy equipment used to generate electricity or heat or cool a structure, as applied to swimming pools, to exclude those located at single-family residences.
Title
Renewable Energy Incentive Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-17 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2009-12-17 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13386-13387) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3136 (Related) 2009-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
HB5252 (Related) 2010-05-06 - Referred to House Energy and Commerce
HB5931 (Related) 2010-07-29 - Referred to House Energy and Commerce
HB5252 (Related) 2010-05-06 - Referred to House Energy and Commerce
HB5931 (Related) 2010-07-29 - Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Income tax credits
Land use and conservation
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Public utilities and utility rates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/2899/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s2899/BILLS-111s2899is.pdf |