US SB289 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commercial Real Estate and Economic Development Act of 2013 or CREED Act of 2013 - Reinstates the authority for Small Business Administration (SBA) low-interest refinancing of small business debt not involving business expansion under the SBA's local development business loan program during any fiscal year in which the cost to the federal government for making loan guarantees under such program is zero. Repeals a provision of the Small Business Jobs Act of 2010 which terminated such authority as of September 27, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Real Estate and Economic Development Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167.
2013-09-10SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment. With written report No. 113-89.
2013-06-17SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2013-06-13SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
2013-03-14SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-309.
2013-02-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (text of measure as introduced: CR S661)
2013-02-12SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S660-661)

Same As/Similar To

HB1240 (Related) 2013-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback