US SB2883 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6781)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6781)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow rehabilitation expenditures for public school buildings to qualify for rehabilitation credit.
Title
School Infrastructure Modernization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6781) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4086 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HR774 (Similar To) 2021-11-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2883/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2883/BILLS-117s2883is.pdf |