US SB288 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to prevent, treat, and cure tuberculosis globally.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End Tuberculosis Now Act of 2024

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-23HouseHeld at the desk.
2024-09-23HouseReceived in the House.
2024-09-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-09-19SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6317-6318)
2024-09-19SenateS.Amdt.3291 Amendment SA 3291 proposed by Senator Murray for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S6315-6318)
2024-09-19SenateS.Amdt.3291 Amendment SA 3291 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2024-09-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6318)
2024-09-19SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2023-02-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB1776 (Same As) 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB9161 (Related) 2024-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development.
SB4773 (Related) 2024-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback