US SB2870 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 661.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 661.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amache Study Act
Title
Amache Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 661. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-375. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5844 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Colorado
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Japan
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Japan
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history