US SB2868 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to temporarily extend the public debt limit until December 16, 2022.
Title
A bill to temporarily extend the public debt limit until December 16, 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138. |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S6743) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5305 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1301 (Related) 2021-10-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-50.
HR716 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1301 (Related) 2021-10-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-50.
HR716 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2868/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2868/BILLS-117s2868pcs.pdf |