US SB2842 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Addiction Recovery Fraud Prevention Act of 2018
Title
Opioid Addiction Recovery Fraud Prevention Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-285. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2251 Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3744 (Related) 2018-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Federal preemption
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations
Commerce
Consumer affairs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Federal preemption
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Health promotion and preventive care
Marketing and advertising
State and local government operations