US SB2840 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2020 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, and for other purposes.
Title
Essential National Security Authorities Act for Fiscal Year 2020
Sponsors
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305. |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1215 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2437-2438)
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2731 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1215 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2437-2438)
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2731 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Afghanistan
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Aviation and airports
Chemical and biological weapons
Collective security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Defense Nuclear Facilities Safety Board
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Illinois
Iraq
Land transfers
Massachusetts
Middle East
Military command and structure
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
New Mexico
New York State
Norway
Nuclear weapons
Pakistan
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Special education
Syria
Texas
Transportation costs
Transportation safety and security
United Kingdom
Veterans' medical care
Afghanistan
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Aviation and airports
Chemical and biological weapons
Collective security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Defense Nuclear Facilities Safety Board
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Illinois
Iraq
Land transfers
Massachusetts
Middle East
Military command and structure
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
New Mexico
New York State
Norway
Nuclear weapons
Pakistan
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Special education
Syria
Texas
Transportation costs
Transportation safety and security
United Kingdom
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2840/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2840/BILLS-116s2840pcs.pdf |