US SB2838 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Director of the Government Publishing Office to establish and maintain an online portal accessible to the public that allows the public to obtain electronic copies of all congressionally mandated reports in one place, and for other purposes.
Title
Access to Congressionally Mandated Reports Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-106. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2485 (Related) 2021-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2055 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2055 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.