US SB2820 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide rental vouchers for the homeless, and for other purposes.
Title
DASH Act Decent, Affordable, Safe Housing for all Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1728 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB2554 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1882 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5219 (Related) 2021-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2554 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1882 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB5219 (Related) 2021-09-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2820/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2820/BILLS-117s2820is.pdf |