US SB2816 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize through FY2021 a diesel emissions reduction program. The program authorizes the Environmental Protection Agency to provide grants, rebates, or loans for reducing diesel emissions from certain diesel vehicles or fleets by retrofitting or replacing their engines.
Title
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 525. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 114-284. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Environmental protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor carriers
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles