US SB2805 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises and extends until December 4, 2021, the Railroad Rehabilitation Improvement and Financing program. Specifically, the bill revises program purposes to include financing economic development and infrastructure that (1) incorporates private investment of greater than 20% of total project costs; (2) is physically connected to, or within one half mile walking distance from, a passenger rail station or minimodal station that includes rail services; (3) will commerce construction within 90 days after the loan or loan guarantee is obligated for the project; and (4) demonstrates the ability to generate new financial assistance for the relevant passenger rail station or service. The bill requires the Department of Transportation to periodically report to Congress on the number of applications for loans and loan guarantees under the program.
Title
TOD Advancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 516. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-255. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Government lending and loan guarantees
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Economic development
Government lending and loan guarantees
Railroads
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding