US SB2794 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-209.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to increase automatic maximum coverage under the Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance program and the Veterans' Group Life Insurance program, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Families of the Fallen Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tommy Tuberville [R-AL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 425 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-209. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 470). (text: CR H8192) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8277-8278) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2794. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8192-8193) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-03-24 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-03-24 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1753-1754; text: CR S1754) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 290. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |