US SB2792 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - An errata sheet on written report No. 117-39 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An original bill to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2022 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2022

Sponsors

Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 117-39 was printed.
2021-09-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 129.
2021-09-22SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Reed. With written report No. 117-39.

Same As/Similar To

HB4104 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB4339 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB4397 (Related) 2021-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB4560 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5147 (Related) 2021-08-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB5158 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB5302 (Related) 2021-09-20 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB21 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1520 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1923 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2378 (Related) 2021-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2395 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S4982-4983; Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4982)
SB2402 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2518 (Related) 2021-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2526 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2378 (Related) 2021-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB3769 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB2058 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text: CR S4548)
SB2903 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2904 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2905 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2906 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB5862 (Related) 2021-11-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Afghanistan
Africa
Air quality
Alliances
Appropriations
Arctic and polar regions
Arkansas
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Australia
Building construction
Buy American requirements
Chemical and biological weapons
China
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Collective security
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Cultural exchanges and relations
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Disaster relief and insurance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Estonia
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Illinois
India
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Iran
Iraq
Israel
Japan
Landlord and tenant
Latvia
Lawyers and legal services
Lithuania
Livestock
Manufacturing
Maryland
Meat
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Metals
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military law
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Missing persons
National Guard and reserves
Neurological disorders
New Zealand
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Pakistan
Performance measurement
Philippines
Pornography
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Russia
Saudi Arabia
Securities
Sex offenses
Singapore
Solid waste and recycling
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Spacecraft and satellites
Strategic materials and reserves
Syria
Taiwan
Technology assessment
Terrorism
Thailand
Ukraine
Veterans' medical care
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback