US SB2788 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to transfer certain funds to the 1974 United Mine Workers of America Pension Plan, and for other purposes.
Title
Bipartisan American Miners Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB934 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
HB935 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB27 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB671 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB935 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB27 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB671 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Mining
Worker safety and health
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Mining
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2788/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2788/BILLS-116s2788is.pdf |