US SB2787 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the role of doctors of podiatric medicine in the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the role of doctors of podiatric medicine in the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2545 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-96.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2787/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2787/BILLS-117s2787is.pdf |