US SB2782 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 520.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to ensure that allegations of sexual assault and sexual harassment are investigated thoroughly and promptly. NOAA must ensure that such allegations are investigated within 48 hours after they are reported. If pursuant to an investigation NOAA finds evidence that a crime has been committed it must refer the matter to the appropriate law enforcement authorities, including the appropriate United States Attorney's office.
Title
A bill to improve provisions of law relating to sexual harassment and assault prevention at the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 520. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-259. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6636 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Science, technology, communications
Sex offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Science, technology, communications
Sex offenses