US SB2779 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Zimbabwe Democracy and Economic Recovery Amendment Act of 2018 This bill amends the Zimbabwe Democracy and Economic Recovery Act of 2001 to establish additional pre- and post- election conditions that Zimbabwe must satisfy in order to remove Department of the Treasury opposition to: (1) international financial institution loan, credit, or guarantee extensions to Zimbabwe; or (2) cancellation or reduction of debt owed by Zimbabwe to the United States or any international financial institution. The bill includes Australia and the United Kingdom in consultations regarding Zimbabwe's political violence and any future removal of related sanctions.
Title
Zimbabwe Democracy and Economic Recovery Amendment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-231. |
2018-08-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-08-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-25 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7670-7671) |
2018-07-25 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7670-7672) |
2018-07-25 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-07-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-07-25 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-07-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5320) |
2018-07-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.3541 Amendment SA 3541 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.3541 Amendment SA 3541 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Flake. (consideration: CR S5320) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5319-5320) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 499. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6472 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2595 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2595 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Africa
Australia
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Farmland
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Land transfers
Monetary policy
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Oceania
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Unemployment
United Kingdom
Zimbabwe
Australia
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Farmland
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
International organizations and cooperation
Land transfers
Monetary policy
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Oceania
Property rights
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Unemployment
United Kingdom
Zimbabwe