US SB2779 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-231.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Zimbabwe Democracy and Economic Recovery Amendment Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zimbabwe Democracy and Economic Recovery Amendment Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-08HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-231.
2018-08-08HouseSigned by President.
2018-08-01HousePresented to President.
2018-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-25HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7670-7671)
2018-07-25HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7670-7672)
2018-07-25HouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2018-07-25HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-07-25HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-07-25HouseReceived in the House.
2018-07-25SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5320)
2018-07-25SenateS.Amdt.3541 Amendment SA 3541 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-25SenateS.Amdt.3541 Amendment SA 3541 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Flake. (consideration: CR S5320) In the nature of a substitute.
2018-07-25SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-25SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5319-5320)
2018-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 499.
2018-06-28SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-06-26SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-04-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB6472 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback