US SB2771 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-208.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-208.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in San Angelo, Texas, as the "Colonel Charles and JoAnne Powell Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".
Title
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in San Angelo, Texas, as the "Colonel Charles and JoAnne Powell Department of Veterans Affairs Clinic".
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-208. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7942) |
2022-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2771. |
2022-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7942-7944) |
2022-09-19 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-03-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S998) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S998) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4328 (Related) 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.