US SB2764 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to make available parental leave benefits to parents following the birth or adoption of a child, and for other purposes.
Title
New Parents Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5808 (Related) 2021-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2764/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2764/BILLS-117s2764is.pdf |