US SB2764 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 733.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 733.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sustainable Shark Fisheries and Trade Act of 2018
Title
Sustainable Shark Fisheries and Trade Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 733. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-442. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5248 (Related) 2018-04-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural trade
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Seafood
Trade restrictions
Agricultural trade
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Seafood
Trade restrictions