US SB2747 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses voter registration and voting access, election integrity and security, redistricting, and campaign finance. Specifically, the bill expands voter registration (e.g., automatic and same-day registration) and voting access (e.g., vote-by-mail and early voting). It also limits removing voters from voter rolls. Next, the bill establishes Election Day as a federal holiday. The bill declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because that individual has been convicted of a criminal offense unless, at the time of the election, such individual is serving a felony sentence. The bill establishes certain federal criminal offenses related to voting. In particular, the bill establishes a new criminal offense for conduct (or attempted conduct) to corruptly hinder, interfere with, or prevent another person from registering to vote or helping someone register to vote. Additionally, the bill sets forth provisions related to election security, including by requiring states to conduct post-election audits for federal elections. The bill outlines criteria for congressional redistricting and generally prohibits mid-decade redistricting. The bill addresses campaign finance, including by expanding the prohibition on campaign spending by foreign nationals, requiring additional disclosure of campaign-related fundraising and spending, requiring additional disclaimers regarding certain political advertising, and establishing an alternative campaign funding system for certain federal offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom to Vote Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-20SenateMotion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
2021-10-20SenateCloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 51. Record Vote Number: 420. (CR S7107-7108)
2021-10-18SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S7028)
2021-10-18SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7028)
2021-09-15SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
2021-09-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Same As/Similar To

HB65 (Related) 2021-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB576 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB774 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB966 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB989 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1172 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1245 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1278 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1515 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB3555 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
HB4064 (Related) 2021-06-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5053 (Related) 2021-08-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB215 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB481 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1539 (Related) 2021-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1823 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2626 (Related) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
SB2615 (Related) 2021-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adult day care
Buy American requirements
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Commemorative events and holidays
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Corporate finance and management
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Treasury
Digital media
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Due process and equal protection
Election Assistance Commission
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Family relationships
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Food industry and services
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
House of Representatives
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Internet, web applications, social media
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Labor-management relations
Landlord and tenant
Low- and moderate-income housing
Manufacturing
Military personnel and dependents
Political advertising
Political parties and affiliation
Postal service
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Supreme Court
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Voting rights

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback