US SB2718 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses water management infrastructure and improvement, groundwater management, and water conservation and environmental restoration in certain western states. Specifically, the bill increases the authorization of appropriations to fund research agreements between the Bureau of Reclamation and eligible entities for water management improvement. The bill expands eligibility for such agreements to include nonprofit conservation organizations. The bill also reauthorizes through FY2024 a program through which Interior is authorized to assist eligible desalination projects. The bill lowers cost-sharing requirements under the program for rural desalination projects. Further, the bill allows certain financial assistance made available under an existing drought relief program to be used to assist state and tribal governments in addressing drought-related impacts to water supplies or any other immediate water-related crises. The bill reauthorizes the program through FY2030. Additionally, the bill increases the maximum federal share of costs for certain infrastructure improvements and activities for groundwater management that provide benefits to consumptive water users (i.e., users of water that is not returned to a stream, river, or water treatment plant) and nonconsumptive ecological or recreational values. The bill also requires Reclamation to carry out a water acquisition program in specified river basins. Further, Interior must analyze the extent to which changes in water supply will affect native biodiversity and must produce strategies for sustaining native biodiversity during periods of drought.
Title
Western Water Security Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4891 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 558.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Endangered and threatened species
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental health
Environmental technology
Farmland
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Hawaii
Hydrology and hydrography
Infrastructure development
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Mining
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Texas
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Agricultural practices and innovations
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Endangered and threatened species
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental health
Environmental technology
Farmland
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Hawaii
Hydrology and hydrography
Infrastructure development
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Mining
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Texas
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2718/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2718/BILLS-116s2718is.pdf |