US SB2708 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2265-2266)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2265-2266)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Choose Medicare Act
Title
Choose Medicare Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2265-2266) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3258 (Related) 2017-07-20 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6046)
HB5258 (Related) 2018-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1307 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3330-3331)
SB1462 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6117 (Same As) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
HB5258 (Related) 2018-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1307 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3330-3331)
SB1462 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6117 (Same As) 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2708/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2708/BILLS-115s2708is.pdf |