US SB2700 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FDA and NIH Workforce Authorities Modernization Act This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise the Silvio O. Conte Senior Biomedical Research Service to: (1) remove the limit on the number of members, (2) expand eligibility for appointment, (3) set a maximum pay rate, and (4) remove the option for members to contribute to the retirement system of an institution of higher education. The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must report on these amendments. This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to grant the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) additional hiring authority for scientific, technical, or professional positions that support the development, review, and regulation of medical products. The FDA must report on its need for qualified individuals for such positions and must include a recruitment and retention plan. The GAO must report on the FDA's ability to hire, train, and retain qualified staff. The FDA must establish one or more Intercenter Institutes. Each institute must coordinate activities applicable to a major disease area among the FDA centers that review products. Activities may include coordinating staff with relevant expertise, streamlining product review, and enhancing interactions with patients, sponsors, and the biomedical community. Scientific meetings directly related to the duties of a Department of Health and Human Services professional must not be considered conferences for certain purposes. The bill revises Board of Directors membership, Executive Director compensation, and accounting for the Reagan-Udall Foundation for the FDA. The Paperwork Reduction Act does not apply to National Institutes of Health research.
Title
FDA and NIH Workforce Authorities Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 427. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2435 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2439 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5414 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB2439 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5414 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Scientific communication
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs
Appropriations
Cell biology and embryology
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Scientific communication
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Transportation costs