US SB269 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Tanana Tribal Council located in Tanana, Alaska, and to the Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation located in Dillingham, Alaska, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Tanana Tribal Council in Tanana, Alaska, all interest of the United States in and to certain property (including all land, improvements, and appurtenances) containing 11.25 acres, in the village of Tanana for use in connection with health and social services programs. (Sec. 2) HHS shall convey to the Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation in Dillingham, Alaska, all interest of the United States in and to certain property included in the Dental Annex Subdivision containing 1.474 acres more or less, also for use in connection with health and social services programs. Such conveyances by warranty deed: (1) shall supersede and render of no future effect any quitclaim deed to the property executed by HHS and the Council or Corporation; and (2) shall not require any consideration from the Council or Corporation for the property, impose any obligation, term, or condition on the Council or Corporation, or allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. The Council or Corporation shall not be liable for soil, surface water, groundwater, or other contamination resulting from the disposal, release, or presence of environmental contamination. HHS shall: (1) be accorded any easement or access to the conveyed property as may be necessary to satisfy any retained obligations and liability; and (2) comply with requirements under the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 for certain deeds for the transfer of U.S.-owned real property on which any hazardous substance was stored for one year or more, disposed of, or known to have been released.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Tanana Tribal Council located in Tanana, Alaska, and to the Bristol Bay Area Health Corporation located in Dillingham, Alaska, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2018-03-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2018-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-26HouseReceived in the House.
2018-03-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-03-22SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1968-1969; text: CR S1969)
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 24.
2017-03-27SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-11.
2017-02-08SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
2017-02-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB236 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback