US SB268 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-18.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act This bill reauthorizes and revises several wildlife conservation programs, establishes requirements for invasive species management, and requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (USFWS) to establish certain prize competitions. Specifically, the bill reauthorizes through FY2023 (1) the Partners for Fish and Wildlife Program; and (2) accounts under the Multinational Species Conservation Fund for the protection of African elephants, Asian elephants, rhinoceros, tigers, and great apes. The bill reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Marine Turtle Conservation Fund, including to expand the fund to include funding for the conservation of tortoises and freshwater turtles. In addition, the bill requires certain federal agencies to (1) control and manage invasive species, and (2) develop strategic plans for implementing invasive species programs designed to achieve substantive annual net reductions of invasive species populations or infested acreage on land or water. Finally, the USFWS must establish Theodore Roosevelt Genius Prizes to encourage technological innovation with the potential to advance the mission of the USFWS with respect to the prevention of wildlife poaching and trafficking, promotion of wildlife conservation, management of invasive species, protection of endangered species, and nonlethal management of human-wildlife conflicts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILD Act Wildlife Innovation and Longevity Driver Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-18.
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 20.
2019-02-05SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-02-05SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB872 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback