US SB2675 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7-1)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an additional $48 billion in FY2021 for the Restaurant Revitalization Fund and designates specified amounts for fund administrative expenses and audits of grants made from the fund. The fund was established in response to COVID-19 to make grants to eligible food and beverage purveyors for covering specified costs such as payroll, operational expenses, and paid sick leave. The bill designates the funding as emergency spending, which is exempt from discretionary spending limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Emergency Support for Restaurants Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
2021-08-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Same As/Similar To

HB3807 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Received in the Senate.
SB2091 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HR1033 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback