US SB2670 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 119.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 119.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for redistricting reform, and for other purposes.
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 119. |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S5937-5946) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB134 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
HB134 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2670/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2670/BILLS-117s2670pcs.pdf |