US SB267 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Treasury to provide a capital increase for the North American Development Bank, a financial institution the United States and Mexico created to develop infrastructure that protect the environment along their shared border. Treasury may subscribe to and purchase 150,000 shares of the bank's capital stock, to the extent that funds are appropriated for such a purpose. Treasury shall support projects related to water pollution and conservation, waste treatment, natural gas and energy security, expanding land border crossings, and reducing pollution related to such traffic. It shall also support developing various performance measures at the bank and report to Congress about its progress imposing such measures.
Title
North American Development Bank Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB132 (Same As) 2019-09-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 23.
HB3895 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3052 (Related) 2019-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5430 (Related) 2020-10-21 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 116-283. Additional views filed.
HB3895 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3052 (Related) 2019-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5430 (Related) 2020-10-21 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 116-283. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign loans and debt
International affairs
Latin America
Mexico
Motor vehicles
Multilateral development programs
North America
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pipelines
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign loans and debt
International affairs
Latin America
Mexico
Motor vehicles
Multilateral development programs
North America
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pipelines
Roads and highways
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/267/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s267/BILLS-116s267is.pdf |