US SB2669 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a duty to report election interference from foreign entities, applies existing campaign advertising requirements to online advertisements, and generally limits political spending and election interference by foreign entities. Specifically, a political committee must report certain foreign contacts involving an offer of unlawful election assistance to the Federal Bureau of Investigation and the Federal Election Commission. The bill establishes criminal penalties for violations of these requirements. Existing requirements for political advertisements and electioneering communications apply to internet and digital advertisements, including requirements related to disclosures and contributions. Additionally, large online platforms must maintain a public database of certain political advertisements. The bill places limitations on political spending by foreign entities. Specifically, foreign entities may not (1) contribute to campaigns related to ballot initiatives and referenda, or (2) make disbursements for certain internet activity referring to a candidate or a political issue. A candidate is prohibited from offering to share nonpublic campaign information with certain foreign entities. The bill also prohibits (1) the dissemination of false statements regarding federal elections or public endorsement, or (2) the intentional hindering of voting or registering to vote. The bill establishes criminal penalties and a private right of action with respect to these prohibitions.
Title
SHIELD Act Stopping Harmful Interference in Elections for a Lasting Democracy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4703 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4617 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
News media and reporting
Photography and imaging
Political advertising
Public participation and lobbying
Sound recording
Subversive activities
Voting rights
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
News media and reporting
Photography and imaging
Political advertising
Public participation and lobbying
Sound recording
Subversive activities
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2669/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2669/BILLS-116s2669is.pdf |