US SB2663 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reforming CFPB Indirect Auto Financing Guidance Act This bill declares without force or effect Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) Bulletin 2013-02 (Indirect Auto Lending and Compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act), published March 21, 2013. The Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 is amended to direct the CFPB, when proposing and issuing guidance primarily related to indirect auto financing, to: provide for a public notice and comment period before issuing the guidance in final form; make publicly available all information relied on by the CFPB; redact any information exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act; consult with the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, the Federal Trade Commission, and the Department of Justice; and study the costs and impacts of the guidance to consumers and women-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small businesses, including consumers and small businesses in rural areas.
Title
Reforming CFPB Indirect Auto Financing Guidance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1737 (Related) 2015-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor vehicles
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor vehicles
Rural conditions and development
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2663/BILLS-114s2663is.pdf |